EP4364042 - TRAINING A MACHINE LEARNING MODEL TO IDENTIFY A RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN DATA ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIE, Yimin Montreal, Québec H4B 2T5 / CA | 02 /
LI, Xiaoming Montreal, Québec H4B 2R5 / CA | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/19] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | Application number, filing date | 21739461.8 | 01.07.2021 | [2024/19] | WO2021IB55913 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023275599 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364042 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N20/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06N3/09 (EP);
H04W24/02 (US);
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
H04L43/0805 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | TRAINIEREN EINES MASCHINENLERNMODELLS ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER BEZIEHUNG ZWISCHEN DATENELEMENTEN | [2024/19] | English: | TRAINING A MACHINE LEARNING MODEL TO IDENTIFY A RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN DATA ITEMS | [2024/19] | French: | FORMATION D'UN MODÈLE D'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE POUR IDENTIFIER UNE RELATION ENTRE DES ÉLÉMENTS DE DONNÉES | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US10148677 (MUDDU SUDHAKAR [US], et al); |