EP4251104 - A DEVICE FOR THE DELIVERY OF A MIST OF A DOSE OF AN OPHTHALMIC LIQUID, AND A PUMP SUITABLE FOR DEVICES FOR THE DELIVERY OF A MIST OF AN OPHTHALMIC LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eye-Go A/S Agern Alle 5A 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGEL, Henrik 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | 02 /
WESTERLUND, Joel Vion 24231 Hörby / SE | 03 /
GYRN, Steffen 4100 Ringsted / DK | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21740436.7 | 29.06.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021EP67824 | Priority number, date | DK2020PA70800 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: DK PA202070800 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022111865 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4251104 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/00, A61M11/00, B05B11/00 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61F9/0008 (EP);
A61F9/0026 (US);
A61M11/007 (EP,US);
B05B11/1087 (EP,US);
B05B11/1091 (EP,US);
B05B7/0483 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE EINES NEBELS EINER DOSIS EINER OPHTHALMISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT UND PUMPE FÜR VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ABGABE EINES NEBELS EINER OPHTHALMISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2023/40] | English: | A DEVICE FOR THE DELIVERY OF A MIST OF A DOSE OF AN OPHTHALMIC LIQUID, AND A PUMP SUITABLE FOR DEVICES FOR THE DELIVERY OF A MIST OF AN OPHTHALMIC LIQUID | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN BROUILLARD D'UNE DOSE D'UN LIQUIDE OPHTALMIQUE, ET POMPE APPROPRIÉE POUR DES DISPOSITIFS DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN BROUILLARD D'UN LIQUIDE OPHTALMIQUE | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 22.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5881956 (COHEN BEN Z [US], et al); | [A]WO2005048875 (MEDICAL INSTILL TECH INC [US], et al); | [A]US2018235807 (NIELSEN SØREN ANKER [DK], et al) | by applicant | WO2015114139 | WO2017021168 |