EP4092832 - FDD-TYPE ANTENNA APPARATUS IMPLEMENTING SPATIAL-POLARIZATION SEPARATION OF BEAMS BY USING QUAD-POLARIZED ANTENNA MODULE ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-19 Yeongcheon-ro Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18462 / KR | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOON, Young Chan 104-601, 4-27, Yeongtong-ro 90beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16692 / KR | 02 /
SO, Sung Hwan 111-706, 10, Yeongtong-ro 61beon-gil Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18377 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Oh Seog 880-604, 68, Dongtansupsok-ro Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18430 / KR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21740773.3 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021KR00623 | Priority number, date | KR20200006676 | 17.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200006676 | KR20200051182 | 28.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200051182 | [2022/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145735 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092832 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/24, H01Q25/00, H01Q1/52, H01Q3/34, // H04B1/56 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q5/28 (US);
H01Q1/525 (EP);
H01Q25/001 (EP);
H01Q25/004 (EP);
H01Q3/34 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | H01Q21/24, H01Q3/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | FDD-ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG MIT IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER RÄUMLICHEN POLARISATIONSTRENNUNG VON STRAHLEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER QUAD-POLARISIERTEN ANTENNENMODULGRUPPE | [2022/47] | English: | FDD-TYPE ANTENNA APPARATUS IMPLEMENTING SPATIAL-POLARIZATION SEPARATION OF BEAMS BY USING QUAD-POLARIZED ANTENNA MODULE ARRAY | [2022/47] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANTENNE DE TYPE À DUPLEXAGE PAR RÉPARTITION EN FRÉQUENCE METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE SÉPARATION PAR POLARISATION SPATIALE DE FAISCEAUX À L'AIDE D'UN RÉSEAU DE MODULES D'ANTENNE À QUADRUPLE POLARISATION | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2022 | Translation filed | 16.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 06.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015222025 (SONG PETER CHUN TECK [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0032] ** figure 4 *; | [A]JP6589101B (KDDI CORP; NIPPON DENGYO KOSAKU CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0017] , [ 0034] , [ 0091] * * figures 1, 3 * | International search | [Y]KR20140140229 (GOODTELL CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * See claim 1 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2015303589 (BI QI [US], et al) [Y] 6-7 * See claim 1 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]JP2017118455 (KDDI CORP, et al) [Y] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0038], claim 1 and figures 1-4. *; | [A]KR101847133B (ACE TECH CORP [KR]) [A] 1-7* See claim 1 and figures 2-7. *; | [A]US2019020124 (SONG PETER CHUN TECK [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * See claim 1 and figures 1-8. * | by applicant | KR20200006676 | KR20200051182 |