EP4066867 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/40] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAGAWA, Rumiko c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Masataka c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21740915.0 | 06.01.2021 | [2022/40] | WO2021JP00185 | Priority number, date | JP20200004872 | 16.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020004872 | [2022/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145249 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066867 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4066867 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/34, A61L15/24, A61L15/60, A61L27/16, A61L27/18, A61L27/40, A61L27/52, A61L29/04, A61L29/06, A61L29/08, A61L29/12, A61L29/14, A61L31/04, A61L31/06, A61L31/10, A61L31/12, A61L31/14, A61P17/00, A61L15/48, A61L27/50, A61P27/02 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61L27/34 (EP,KR);
B29D11/00038 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (KR);
A61K47/34 (KR);
A61L15/24 (EP,KR);
A61L15/26 (KR);
A61L15/48 (EP);
A61L15/60 (EP,KR);
A61L27/16 (KR);
A61L27/18 (KR);
A61L27/40 (KR);
A61L27/50 (EP);
A61L27/52 (EP,KR);
A61L29/06 (KR);
A61L29/08 (KR);
A61L29/085 (EP);
A61L29/12 (KR);
A61L29/14 (EP,KR);
A61L29/145 (EP);
A61L31/06 (KR);
A61L31/10 (EP,KR);
A61L31/12 (KR);
A61L31/14 (EP,KR);
A61L31/145 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP,KR);
G02C7/04 (EP,KR);
A61L2420/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/24, C08L33/26 (EP);
A61L27/34, C08L33/26 (EP);
A61L29/085, C08L33/26 (EP);
A61L31/10, C08L33/26 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/40] | A61L27/34, A61K47/32, A61K47/34, A61L15/24, A61L15/26, A61L15/60, A61L27/16, A61L27/18, A61L27/40, A61L27/52, A61L29/04, A61L29/06, A61L29/08, A61L29/12, A61L29/14, A61L31/04, A61L31/06, A61L31/10, A61L31/12, A61L31/14, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIZINPRODUKTS | [2022/40] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEDICAL DEVICE | [2022/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | Translation filed | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 12.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03030940 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [A] 1-12* claim 1; p. 13 last paragraph * | International search | [A]WO2017146101 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims *; | [A]WO2017146102 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-12* claims *; | [A]WO2018207644 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims *; | [A]WO2019031477 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims 14, 15, paragraph [0114] * | by applicant | JP2010088858 | WO2013024799 | WO2013024800 | JP2013119555 | JP2014533381 | WO2017146102 | WO2019031477 |