EP4090913 - FLEXIBLE CAPACITIVE MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of British Columbia University Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHLING, Robert c/o University-Industry Liaison Office, 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | 02 /
GERARDO, Carlos D. c/o University-Industry Liaison Office, 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | 03 /
CRETU, Edmond c/o University-Industry Liaison Office, 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21741167.7 | 18.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021CA50052 | Priority number, date | US202062962284P | 17.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062962284 P | US202062962285P | 17.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062962285 P | US202062962291P | 17.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062962291 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021142554 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4090913 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/48, A61B6/00, A61B8/00, A61N7/00, B08B7/00, G01N23/04, G01N29/34, G01N29/24, G01N29/04, B06B1/02, A61B8/08, A61B8/06, A61B6/50, A61B6/04, A61B5/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G01N29/043 (EP,KR);
A61B8/5261 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,KR);
A61B6/0442 (EP,KR);
A61B6/0492 (EP,KR);
A61B6/4417 (EP,KR);
A61B6/502 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,KR);
A61B8/0825 (EP,KR);
A61B8/4227 (EP,KR);
A61B8/4236 (EP,KR);
A61B8/4416 (US);
A61B8/4472 (EP,KR);
A61B8/4483 (EP,KR);
A61B8/4494 (EP,KR);
A61B8/485 (EP,KR);
A61B8/488 (EP,KR);
A61N7/00 (EP,KR);
B06B1/0292 (EP,KR,US);
B81B3/0021 (US);
G01N23/04 (EP,KR);
G01N29/2406 (EP,KR,US);
B06B2201/76 (EP,KR);
B81B2203/0127 (US);
B81B2203/0315 (US);
B81B2203/04 (US);
B81B2207/053 (US);
G01N2291/0231 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/0232 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/0234 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | G01D5/48, A61B6/00, A61B8/00, A61N7/00, B08B7/00, G01N23/04, G01N29/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE KAPAZITIVE MIKROBEARBEITETE ULTRASCHALLWANDLER-ARRAYS | [2022/47] | English: | FLEXIBLE CAPACITIVE MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER ARRAYS | [2022/47] | French: | RÉSEAUX DE TRANSDUCTEURS ULTRASONORES MICRO-USINÉS CAPACITIFS SOUPLES | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014169527 (LUO SHIH-BIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * claims 1,5 *; | [YA]US2018344167 (XIANG LIANGZHONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,15 * figures 3A-3C,11 * * claims 1,9,16-17 * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0083] * [A] 12-14; | [YA]US2019187101 (GERARDO CARLOS D [CA], et al) [Y] 1-11,15 * paragraph [0158] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0214] * * paragraph [0232] * [A] 12-14; | [A] - WANG M ET AL, "A photoacoustic imager with infrared illumination through the CMUT chip", 2011 16TH INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS CONFERENCE (TRANSDUCERS 2011) ; BEIJING, CHINA; 5 - 9 JUNE 2011, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20110605), doi:10.1109/TRANSDUCERS.2011.5969389, ISBN 978-1-4577-0157-3, pages 2188 - 2191, XP031910730 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRANSDUCERS.2011.5969389 | International search | [A]US2003024317 (MILLER DAVID G [US]) [A] 1-139*abstract; paragraphs 0007, 0016, 0019, 0023 - 0025; fig. 1*; | [A]US2005146247 (FISHER RAYETTE A [US], et al) [A] 1-139 *abstract; paragraphs 0012, 0017 - 0023, 0039; fig. 6*; | [Y]US2008194053 (HUANG YONGLI [US]) [Y] 41 - 80, 122 - 139 *abstract; paragraphs 0037, 0225, 0226**; | [A]US7759839 (HUANG YONGLI [US]) [A] 1-139 *abstract; cols. 1, 2*; | [Y]US2010280388 (HUANG YONGLI [US]) [Y] 81-121, 122-139 *abstract; paragraphs 0002, 0005, 0009 - 0011, 0029 - 0033, 0039, 0048 - 0050; figs. IA, 1B*; | [Y]US2013242705 (KIM YOUNG-IL [KR], et al) [Y] 41 - 80, 122 - 139 *abstract; paragraphs 0008, 0015, 0035 -0039, 0045, 0061; figs. 1A, 1B, 5*; | [A]US2014013850 (KIM YOUNG IL [KR], et al) [A] 1-139 *abstract; paragraphs 0010 - 0030, 0045, 0046; fig. 1*; | [Y]US2017050217 (JOHNSON PETER B [US], et al) [Y] 1 -40, 122 -139 *abstract; paragraphs 0002 - 0005, 0012, 0044*; | [Y]US9662679 (CHEN LI [US], et al) [Y] 81-121, 122-139 *abstract; col. 4, lines 41-44; col. 5, lines 28-36; col. 6, lines 22-44; col. 7, lines 37-44*; | [Y]US2018036558 (CARPENTIER ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1 -40, 122 -139 *abstract; paragraphs 0005, 0018, 0033 0068, 0072, 0081, 0082, 0085; figs. 3, 4, 12*; | [A]US2019187101 (GERARDO CARLOS D [CA], et al) [A] 1-139 *abstract; paragraphs 0004, 0005, 0035, 0197; figs. 17, 18* |