EP4092151 - HIGH CORROSION-RESISTANCE STRIP STEEL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL CO., LTD. No. 885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Bo No.885, Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | 02 /
JIAO, Sihai No.885, Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 21741882.1 | 12.01.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021CN71186 | Priority number, date | CN20201031109 | 13.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010031109 | [2022/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021143661 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092151 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/22, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/60, C22C14/00, B32B15/01 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
B32B15/011 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21B1/22 (CN,KR,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21C37/02 (CN,KR);
B21C47/02 (KR);
B23K31/02 (EP);
B32B15/013 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D1/02 (EP);
C21D1/19 (EP);
C21D1/60 (EP);
C21D6/004 (EP);
C21D8/0215 (KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0236 (KR);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D8/0273 (EP);
C21D8/0278 (KR);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C22C14/00 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP);
C22C38/002 (CN);
C22C38/005 (CN);
C22C38/008 (CN);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/28 (EP);
C22C38/42 (CN);
C22C38/44 (CN);
C22C38/46 (CN);
C22C38/48 (CN);
C22C38/50 (CN);
C22C38/54 (CN);
C22C38/60 (EP,CN);
C23G1/08 (KR);
B23K2101/18 (EP);
B23K2101/34 (EP);
B23K2103/04 (EP);
B23K2103/05 (EP);
B23K2103/14 (EP);
B23K2103/18 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2307/714 (CN,KR);
B32B2307/732 (US);
B32B2311/18 (US);
B32B2311/30 (US);
B32B2413/00 (CN,KR);
C21D2211/001 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | HOCHKORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGER BANDSTAHL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/47] | English: | HIGH CORROSION-RESISTANCE STRIP STEEL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/47] | French: | ACIER EN BANDE À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE À LA CORROSION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2022 | Translation filed | 08.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPS56122681 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] *; | [XI]JP2016108665 (JFE STEEL CORP) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * [I] 9-15; | [I]CN109695000 (ANGANG STEEL CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]EP3546611 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2019344315 (YAN BO [CN], et al) [I] 1-15* abstract * | International search | [A]JPH06235050 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [X]CN108085585 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]CN108580555 (WISDRI ENG & RES INC LTD CO) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]CN109108071 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]CN109306436 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]CN110499453 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL) [A] 1-15 * entire document * |