EP4367567 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING AN INSPECTION DRONE WITH RESPECT TO A STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANCHAROV, Volodya 171 67 SOLNA / SE | 02 /
COMBES, Steven WORTHING, BN13 IQT / GB | 03 /
SVERRISSON, Sigurdur 19632 Kungsängen / SE | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 21742083.5 | 05.07.2021 | [2024/20] | WO2021EP68489 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023280377 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367567 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/10, G05D1/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G05D1/0094 (EP);
G05D1/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINER INSPEKTIONSDROHNE IN BEZUG AUF EINE STRUKTUR | [2024/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING AN INSPECTION DRONE WITH RESPECT TO A STRUCTURE | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT D'UN DRONE D'INSPECTION PAR RAPPORT À UNE STRUCTURE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2015105886 (PICTOMETRY INT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] - [0030] - [0056] , [0061] - [0062] - [0083] - [0084] - [0086] - [0087]; figures 1-2,5; claims 1,19 *; | [Y]US2016232792 (VAN CRUYNINGEN IZAK JAN [US]) [Y] 1-17* paragraph [0024]; figure 2; claims 1,4,5 * |