EP4127123 - SOAP COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA Corporate Legal & Compliance - IP Group Rue de la Bergère 7 1242 Satigny / CH | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Pabitra SINGAPORE 638377 / SG | 02 /
TANG, Jane Singapore 638377 / SG | 03 /
VITTAL, Aparna SINGAPORE 638377 / SG | 04 /
HURRY, Simon Southall Middlesex UB2 5NN / GB | 05 /
STRUILLOU, Arnaud 1242 Satigny / CH | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Strych, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Strych, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21743183.2 | 14.07.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP69629 | Priority number, date | SG20201006987Y | 22.07.2020 Original published format: SG10202006987Y | EP20200199851 | 02.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20199851 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022017888 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127123 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D9/44 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C11D9/442 (EP,US);
C11D17/0047 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | SEIFENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/06] | English: | SOAP COMPOSITION | [2023/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SAVON | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 27.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002010105 (BACON DENNIS RAY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13 * pages 14,15; examples E,F,H; claims 1,26,27 *; | [X]WO2004113485 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 2; examples 1-5; claim 1 *; | [X]US6869923 (CUNNINGHAM PHILIP ANDREW [GB], et al) [X] 1-13* example -; claim 6 *; | [X]US2005227907 (LEE KAIPING [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11,13 * paragraph [0211]; example B; claim 26 *; | [XI]US2010168251 (WARR JONATHAN FRANK [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11,13 * example -; claims 1,12,14; table 8 * [I] 4-9,12; | [XI]US9487733 (BUDIJONO STÉPHANIE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * columns 17,18 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 11 * [I] 7-9; | [X]US2019275490 (BACHAWALA PRAVEEN [US]) [X] 1-3,10-13 * paragraphs [0091] - [0092] - [0172] , [0182] - [0183]; claim 16 *; | [XP]WO2020148392 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [XP] 1-13 * page 11, line 29; example -; claim -; table - * * page 16 * | by applicant | EP0025799 | WO2007004166 | EP2300146 | WO2013068255 | - A. LEO, Comprehensive Medicinal Chemistry, Pergamon Press, (19900000), page 295 | - C. VUILLEUMIER et al., "Multidimensional Visualization of Physical and Perceptual Data Leading to a Creative Approach in Fragrance Development", Perfume & Flavorist, (20080900), vol. 33, pages 54 - 61 |