EP4175907 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RELATIVE POSITIONING OF A SPREADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargotec Finland Oy Ruskontie 55 33710 Tampere / FI | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Wenyan 33540 Tampere / FI | 02 /
AREF, Mohammad 33610 Tampere / FI | 03 /
VIHONEN, Juho 36240 Kangasala / FI | 04 /
LUKKALA, Jyri 33730 Tampere / FI | 05 /
ASIKAINEN, Mikko 36100 Kangasala / FI | 06 /
SANTAHUHTA, Hannu 35100 Orivesi / FI | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21743220.2 | 02.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021FI50517 | Priority number, date | FI20200005729 | 06.07.2020 Original published format: FI 20205729 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022008793 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175907 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4175907 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/46, B66C19/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
B66C13/46 (EP,US);
B66C19/007 (EP,US);
G06V10/44 (US);
G06V2201/07 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RELATIVEN POSITIONIERUNG EINES STREUERS | [2023/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RELATIVE POSITIONING OF A SPREADER | [2023/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT RELATIF D'UN PALONNIER | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 06.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014169096 (DANA LTD [US]); | [A]EP2796402 (MECATRONIA AUTOMATIZACIONES S L [ES]) |