EP4189295 - METHOD TO CONTROL A CIRCULATION PUMP, IN PARTICULAR A HEATING PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/23] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CIRCULATION PUMP, IN PARTICULAR A HEATING PUMP | ||
[2024/15] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKL, Martin 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Benedikt 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21743458.8 | 12.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021EP69311 | Priority number, date | DE202010120022 | 29.07.2020 Original published format: DE102020120022 | [2023/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022023006 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4189295 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4189295 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10, F04D15/00 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
F04D15/0066 (EP);
F04D15/0088 (EP);
F05D2270/301 (EP);
F05D2270/701 (EP);
F24D19/1012 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINER UMWÄLZPUMPE, INSBESONDERE HEIZUNGSPUMPE | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD TO CONTROL A CIRCULATION PUMP, IN PARTICULAR A HEATING PUMP | [2024/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UNE POMPE DE CIRCULATION, EN PARTICULIER D'UNE POMPE DE CHAUFFAGE | [2024/15] |
Former [2023/23] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A CIRCULATION PUMP, IN PARTICULAR A HEATING PUMP | ||
Former [2023/23] | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION D'UNE POMPE DE CIRCULATION, EN PARTICULIER D'UNE POMPE DE CHAUFFAGE | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 03.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10163987 (GRUNDFOS AS [DK]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 14] , [0 23] - [0025] - [0 33] - [0035] - [0 48] - [0051]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102017203474 (KSB SE & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-3* the whole document * |