EP4093350 - ADJUSTABLE FLOW GLAUCOMA SHUNTS AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shifamed Holdings, LLC 590 Division Street Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Robert 590 Division Street Campbell, California 95008 / US | 02 /
SAPOZHNIKOV, Katherine 590 Division Street Campbell, California 95008 / US | 03 /
ARGENTO, Claudio 590 Division Street Campbell, California 95008 / US | 04 /
SAUL, Tom 590 Division Street Campbell, California 95008 / US | 05 /
LILLY, Richard 590 Division Street Campbell, California 95008 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21744394.4 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14774 | Priority number, date | US202062965117P | 23.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062965117 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021151007 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093350 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007, A61M27/00 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61F9/00781 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0004 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | GLAUKOM-SHUNTS MIT EINSTELLBAREM FLUSS SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2022/48] | English: | ADJUSTABLE FLOW GLAUCOMA SHUNTS AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2022/48] | French: | SHUNTS DE GLAUCOME À DÉBIT RÉGLABLE ET SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES ASSOCIÉS | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9619249 (RUBINSTEIN MARK H [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067]; figures 13c,13d *; | [X]WO2019018807 (SHIFAMED HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 1 - page 4, line 32; figures 2,4 * * page 6, line 9 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 11 - page 7, line 29 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 15 * | International search | [A]WO9219294 (PRYWES ARNOLD S [US]) [A] 1-41* whole document *; | [A]US5300020 (L ESPERANCE JR FRANCIS A [US]) [A] 1-41 * claim 7 *; | [A]US7364564 (SNIEGOWSKI JEFFRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * whole document *; | [A]US2008228127 (BURNS THOMAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * whole document *; | [A]WO2019018807 (SHIFAMED HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [A] 1-41 * paragraphs [0035]-[0046]; claims 9-35; figures 3D-6B * |