EP4094424 - COLOR RENDERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colby, Lydia A. 1951 N. Estancia PL. Eagle, ID 83616 / US | For all designated states Colby, Michael K. 1951 N. Estancia Pl. Eagle, Idaho 83616 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21744474.4 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14784 | Priority number, date | US202062964571P | 22.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062964571 P | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 Original published format: US202117155076 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021151015 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094424 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/0601, H04N1/60, G06T7/90, G06T19/20 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0603 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP);
G06T11/001 (US);
G06T15/005 (US);
G06T19/20 (EP);
G06T7/80 (US);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
G06T2200/24 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2210/04 (EP);
G06T2219/2012 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H04N1/60, G06K9/00, G06K9/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | FARBWIEDERGABE | [2022/48] | English: | COLOR RENDERING | [2022/48] | French: | RENDU DE COULEUR | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 20.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012212786 (NISHIURA MITSUKO [JP]); | [A]US2013058543 (THOMAS MANI V [US], et al); | [XI]CN103577185 (NIU ZHE); | [A]WO2019000409 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2019133505 (PCMS HOLDINGS INC [US]); | International search | [X]US2008062442 (OLSON THOR A [US]) | by applicant | CN103577185 |