Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024289871 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202418656312 | 06.05.2024 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 | US202318348299 | 06.07.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12008636 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2024 | B2 | US2023351490 | 02.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 | US202318348299 | 06.07.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024102157 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2022541824 | 22.01.2021 | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 | WO2021US14784 | 22.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7481456B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2024 | B2 | JP2023511530 | 20.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 | WO2021US14784 | 22.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114902645 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 | WO2021US14784 | 22.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4094424 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | A4 | EP4094424 | 30.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 | WO2021US14784 | 22.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021151015 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11727476 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2023 | B2 | US2021224889 | 22.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062964571 | 22.01.2020 | US202117155076 | 21.01.2021 |