EP4093443 - OXAZINE-BASED FLUOROPHORE COMPOUNDS FOR NERVE-SPECIFIC IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oregon Health & Science University 3181 SW Sam Jackson Park Road Mail Code: L106TT Portland, OR 97239 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBBS, Summer L. Oregon Health & Science University 0690 SW Bancroft Street Portland, OR 97239 / US | 02 /
WANG, Lei G. Oregon Health & Science University 0690 SW Bancroft Street Portland, OR 97239 / US | 03 /
BARTH, Connor W. Oregon Health & Science University 0690 SW Bancroft Street Portland, OR 97239 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21744773.9 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14740 | Priority number, date | US202062965519P | 24.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062965519 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021150979 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093443 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K51/04, C07D498/14, C07D265/38, C07D413/04, C07D498/04, C07D413/14 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
A61K49/0028 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D265/38 (EP,IL,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,IL,US);
C07D498/14 (EP,IL,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | A61K49/00, A61K51/04, C07D498/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | FLUOROPHORE VERBINDUNGEN AUF OXAZINBASIS ZUR NERVENSPEZIFISCHEN ABBILDUNG | [2022/48] | English: | OXAZINE-BASED FLUOROPHORE COMPOUNDS FOR NERVE-SPECIFIC IMAGING | [2022/48] | French: | COMPOSÉS FLUOROPHORES À BASE D'OXAZINE D'IMAGERIE SPÉCIFIQUE DU NERF | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3824074 (BUGAUT A, et al); | [A]WO2005016934 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2018115154 (OREAL [FR]); | [XP]WO2020023911 (UNIV OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE [US]); | International search | [Y]US2016263249 (FRANGIONI JOHN V [US], et al); | [Y]US2017045501 (LAVIS LUKE D [US], et al); | [A]US2017088534 (CLUNAS SCOTT [GB], et al); | [XP]WO2020023911 (UNIV OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE [US]); |