EP4199823 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A MENTAL STATE OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIELE, Sara 75 Cleverly Estate Wormholt Road London Greater London W12 0LY / GB | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21745941.1 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021EP69159 | Priority number, date | GB20200013220 | 24.08.2020 Original published format: GB 202013220 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022042924 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199823 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/16, A61B5/00, A61B5/0531, A61B5/024, A61B5/01 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/165 (EP,US);
A61B5/0024 (EP,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/0531 (EP);
A61B5/0533 (US);
A61B5/6898 (EP);
A61B5/7264 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES MENTALEN ZUSTANDS EINES BENUTZERS | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A MENTAL STATE OF A USER | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER L'ÉTAT MENTAL D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 21.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.2023 | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008091515 (THIEBERGER GIL [IL], et al); | [A]EP2698685 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2016089038 (CHADDERDON III GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US2017249438 (JAIN JAWAHAR [US], et al); | [A]KR20190129532 (UNIV DANKOOK IACF [KR]); | [I]WO2020104722 (UNIV MADRID CARLOS III [ES], et al) | by applicant | US2012116186 | EP2698685 | KR20190129532 | WO2020104722 |