EP4165169 - ZBTB32 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTEVEZ SILVA, Maria Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
GAN, Ye Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
XU, Yufei Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
ORLANDO, Elena Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21746584.8 | 11.06.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021US37048 | Priority number, date | US202063037826P | 11.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063037826 P | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021252920 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4165169 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0783, C12N15/85, A61K35/17 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/17 (KR);
A61K39/001112 (KR);
A61K39/001113 (KR);
A61K39/001117 (KR);
A61K39/001124 (KR);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P37/04 (KR,US);
C07K14/4703 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/40 (KR,US);
C12N15/113 (KR,US);
C12N15/907 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N9/22 (KR,US);
A61K2039/5156 (KR);
A61K2039/5158 (KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/569 (KR,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2310/11 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | ZBTB32 INHIBITOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2023/16] | English: | ZBTB32 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2023/16] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE ZBTB32 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 29.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2019076486 (CELLECTIS [FR]); | by applicant | US2779780 | EP0239400 | US4816567 | US4851332 | WO9109967 | EP0519596 | US5225539 | WO9317105 | WO9404678 | EP0592106 | US5350674 | US5399346 | US5530101 | US5565332 | US5580859 | US5585089 | US5585362 | US5589466 | EP0754230 | WO9724373 | WO9725068 | EP0805871 | US5766886 | US5777084 | US5843674 | US5858358 | US5883223 | WO9928471 | US5952484 | WO0035436 | EP1013761 | US6120766 | WO0112812 | WO0129058 | WO0166139 | US6326193 | US6331415 | WO0196584 | WO0206213 | US6352694 | US6407213 | US6437098 | US6528481 | US6534055 | US6548640 | WO03062401 | WO03064383 | WO03076424 | WO2004005284 | WO2004007529 | US6692964 | US6703199 | US2004101519 | US6780996 | US6797514 | WO2004087758 | US6846911 | WO2005014652 | US2005042664 | US2005048617 | US6867041 | WO2005028443 | WO2005035577 | US6887466 | US2005100543 | US6905680 | US6905681 | US6905874 | US2005129701 | WO2005069894 | WO2005069888 | US2005175606 | WO2005094818 | WO2005097791 | US2006014700 | WO2006010118 | US2006025347 | US2006034810 | WO2006017295 | WO2006020258 | US2006121005 | US7067318 | WO2006069063 | US7083785 | US7090843 | WO2006099141 | WO2006105021 | WO2006121168 | WO2006125481 | US7144575 | WO2006138315 | US2007014794 | WO2007014011 | US7172869 | US7175843 | WO2007024715 | US2007049735 | WO2007067992 | US7232566 | US7253263 | US7410640 | WO2008127735 | US7446190 | WO2008134679 | WO2008146911 | WO2009036082 | WO2009045957 | WO2009055730 | WO2009068204 | WO2009101611 | WO2009114335 | US2009252742 | US2009297529 | US2009304718 | US2009311181 | US7635753 | WO2009155386 | US2010028330 | WO2010033866 | US2010150910 | US7749719 | US7812135 | WO2010126066 | US2010297138 | WO2011028683 | US7915391 | EP2322550 | US2011158957 | WO2011076922 | US8008449 | US2011268656 | US8080650 | WO2011160119 | WO2011159847 | US2012009181 | US2012060230 | WO2012033885 | US2012114649 | WO2012079000 | US8207308 | US8263746 | WO2012135854 | WO2012138475 | EP2514766 | WO2012145493 | US2012276046 | US8309693 | US2012288506 | WO2012163805 | US8344112 | US8354509 | US8362211 | US8388967 | US8399645 | WO2013040557 | WO2013040371 | US8420782 | US2013101607 | WO2013063419 | WO2013061273 | US8440798 | WO2013074916 | WO2013085552 | US8470973 | US8501415 | WO2013123061 | WO2013126712 | WO2013142034 | US2013273055 | WO2013165940 | US2013295007 | WO2013173820 | US8603466 | US8609089 | WO2013192294 | US2014004124 | WO2014031687 | US2014068797 | US8697359 | US8709424 | WO2014089335 | US2014178365 | US8771945 | WO2014110591 | US8795965 | WO2014122144 | WO2014130635 | WO2014130657 | WO2014138805 | WO2014138819 | WO2014144622 | WO2014140248 | WO2014153270 | US8865406 | US8871445 | US2014322275 | WO2014190273 | US8920776 | US2015051266 | WO2015026684 | WO2015031667 | WO2015048577 | US9028823 | US9034324 | WO2015090230 | US2015210769 | US2015232557 | US2015284467 | WO2015158671 | WO2015166073 | WO2015172800 | US2015344844 | WO2015184099 | US9205148 | WO2015188119 | US2015368351 | US2015368349 | US9228016 | US9243058 | WO2016014535 | WO2016014576 | WO2016014565 | WO2016014789 | WO2016020332 | WO2016028896 | US9273141 | WO2016054638 | WO2016057846 | US2016131655 | US9340621 | WO2016079177 | WO2016090327 | WO2016090320 | WO2016087531 | WO2016094304 | US2016176973 | WO2016109410 | WO2016130598 | WO2016154055 | US9464139 | US2016297884 | US2016297885 | WO2016164731 | WO2016196792 | US2016368988 | WO2016210293 | WO2017011804 | WO2017008169 | US2017022284 | WO2017015623 | WO2017021450 | WO2017025038 | WO2017025610 | US2017051308 | US2017051252 | US2017051068 | US2017073386 | WO2017117112 | WO2006US22995 | WO2017US55627 |