EP4098777 - TIN OR TIN ALLOY ELECTROPLATING SOLUTION, METHOD FOR FORMING BUMPS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUSUKI, Kyoka c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute, 1002-14, Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Mami c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute, 1002-14, Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 03 /
NAKAYA, Kiyotaka c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute, 1002-14, Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 04 /
TATSUMI, Koji c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, SANDA PLANT 12-6, Technopark Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1339 / JP | 05 /
INOUE, Jyunta c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, SANDA PLANT 12-6, Technopark Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1339 / JP | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21746984.0 | 04.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021JP00008 | Priority number, date | JP20200011013 | 27.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020011013 | JP20200212144 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020212144 | [2022/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021153160 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098777 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/32, C25D3/60, C25D5/50, C25D7/00 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H05K3/4007 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/32 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/60 (EP,KR);
C25D5/505 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/605 (EP,US);
C25D7/00 (EP,KR);
H05K3/188 (KR);
H01L2224/11 (EP);
H01L2224/13082 (EP);
H05K2203/043 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0723 (US);
H05K3/108 (EP);
H05K3/3473 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPLATTIERUNGSLÖSUNG FÜR ZINN ODER ZINNLEGIERUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HÖCKERN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LEITERPLATTE | [2022/49] | English: | TIN OR TIN ALLOY ELECTROPLATING SOLUTION, METHOD FOR FORMING BUMPS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CIRCUIT BOARD | [2022/49] | French: | SOLUTION D'ÉLECTRODÉPOSITION D'ÉTAIN OU D'ALLIAGE D'ÉTAIN, PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE BOSSES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2022 | Translation filed | 07.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 01.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05311483 (NIKKO KINZOKU KK) [A] 1-4; | [A]JP2000026991 (DAIWA KASEI KENKYUSHO, et al) [A] 1-4; | [A]JP2002530528 [A] 1-4; | [A]US2003101910 (GODWIN EDWARD R [US], et al) [A] 1-4; | [A]JP2005308858 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-4; | [A]WO2010055917 (YUKEN KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4; | [X]JP2015193916 (UYEMURA C & CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * 0001-0002, 0012-0014, 0030, 0042, 0059, 0061-0062, 0065-0066, 0068 *; | [A]US2018118671 (MAITRO-VOGEL SOPHIE [DE], et al)[A] 1-4 | by applicant | JP2015193916 | JP2016074963 | JP6006683B | JP6133056B | JP2020011013 | JP20200212144 |