EP4096802 - METHODS OF SEPARATING HOST CELL LIPASES FROM AN ANTI-LAG3 ANTIBODY PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUTLER, Colette, M. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 02 /
LI, Hong 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 03 /
PATEL, Sketa 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 04 /
RIOS, Sandra, E. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 05 /
WELSH, John, P. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Böhles, Elena Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 21747003.8 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US15368 | Priority number, date | US202062967347P | 29.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062967347 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021154908 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096802 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/30, B01D15/08, C07K1/20, C12N9/18 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
C12Y301/01004 (EP,US);
C07K16/065 (EP,US);
A61K39/39591 (US);
A61K47/183 (US);
A61K47/20 (US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
B01D15/327 (EP,US);
B01D15/362 (EP,US);
B01D15/424 (US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C12N9/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D15/3809, B01D15/363, B01D15/327 (EP);
B01D15/3809, B01D15/363, B01D15/362 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON WIRTSZELLLIPASEN AUS EINER ANTI-LAG3-ANTIKÖRPERPRODUKTION | [2022/49] | English: | METHODS OF SEPARATING HOST CELL LIPASES FROM AN ANTI-LAG3 ANTIBODY PRODUCTION | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE SÉPARATION DE LIPASES DE CELLULES HÔTES D'UNE PRODUCTION D'ANTICORPS ANTI-LAG3 | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US9920120 (YU X CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [X]WO2018204374 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2007060741 (KELLEY BRIAN D [US], et al); | [A]WO2011089062 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [A]WO2014143185 (ABBVIE INC [US]); | [A]US2015044206 (BURKE DAVID J [US], et al); | [YA]WO2015038888 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2015095568 (LEE KELVIN [US], et al); | [YA]WO2016028672 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [A]WO2016057739 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]); | [Y]WO2019129877 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [PY]WO2020023566 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) |