EP4087522 - BIORESORBABLE IMPLANT WITH INSIDE-OUT RESORPTION FOR ENHANCED BONE INGROWTH AND TISSUE INTEGRATION AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SDIP Innovations Pty Ltd. 1700 4th Street Suite 218F - MC2522 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANAVITEHRANI, Iman 1700 4th Street Suite 218F MC2522 San Francisco, California 94158 / US | 02 /
PARVIZ, Maryam 1700 4th Street Suite 218F MC2522 San Francisco, California 94158 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21747012.9 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US15852 | Priority number, date | US202062968056P | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062968056 P | US202063070704P | 26.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063070704 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155248 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087522 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/46, A61L27/18, A61L27/48, A61L27/56, A61L27/58 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/365 (US);
A61L27/10 (US);
A61L27/12 (US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/222 (US);
A61L27/3683 (US);
A61L27/46 (EP,US);
A61L27/48 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/46, C08L69/00 (EP);
A61L27/48, C08L69/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/46] | A61F2/82, A61L29/14, A61L29/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | BIORESORBIERBARES IMPLANTAT MIT INSIDE-OUT-RESORPTION FÜR VERBESSERTES KNOCHENEINWACHSEN UND GEWEBEINTEGRATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DAVON | [2022/46] | English: | BIORESORBABLE IMPLANT WITH INSIDE-OUT RESORPTION FOR ENHANCED BONE INGROWTH AND TISSUE INTEGRATION AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2022/46] | French: | IMPLANT BIORÉSORBABLE AYANT UNE RÉSORPTION INTÉRIEURE-EXTÉRIEURE PERMETTANT LA CROISSANCE OSSEUSE ET L'INTÉGRATION AU TISSU AMÉLIORÉES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6599516 (KNAACK DAVID [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, lines 31-34 * * column 3, lines 46-54 ** column 4, lines 3-8 *; | [A]US2014288663 (BORDEN MARK D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] *; | [X] - MANAVITEHRANI IMAN ET AL, "Formation of porous biodegradable scaffolds based on poly(propylene carbonate) using gas foaming technology", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING C, (20181205), vol. 96, doi:10.1016/J.MSEC.2018.11.088, ISSN 0928-4931, pages 824 - 830, XP085569901 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * 2.1. Materials; page 825, column l * * 2.3. Fabrication of the biodegradable polymer-ceramic implant; page 825, column r * * 2.4. Gas foaming of PPC-starch-bioglass; page 825, column r - page 825, column l * * 3.1. Optimizing the porosity of a PPC-starch-bioglass scaffold; page 827, column r - page 828, column r * * 3.5. In vivo biocompatibility and tissue infiltration; page 829, column l - column r * * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msec.2018.11.088 | [X] - IMAN MANAVITEHRANI ET AL, "Fabrication of a Biodegradable Implant with Tunable Characteristics for Bone Implant Applications", BIOMACROMOLECULES, US, (20170523), vol. 18, no. 6, doi:10.1021/acs.biomac.7b00078, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 1736 - 1746, XP055664999 [X] 1-8,11-15 * abstract * * 2.1 Materials; page 1737, column l - column r * * 2.3. Fabrication of Polymer Blends; page 1737, column r - page 1738, column l * * 2.9. In Vivo Degradation; page 1739, column r - page 1740, column r * * 3.6. In Vivo Biocompatibility and Osseointegration in a Knee Implantation Model; page 1744, column l - page 1745, column l * * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.biomac.7b00078 | International search | [Y]US2005251266 (MASPERO FABRIZIO A [CH], et al) [Y] 5, 20-38 * ; para [0006], [0012], [0015]-[0016], [0044]-[0045], [0047], [0061], [0078], [0082] *; | [A]US2011106255 (LIU JAMES JENQ [US], et al) [A] 1-38* ; see entire document *; | [Y]US2012219635 (LIU JAMES JENQ [US]) [Y] 7, 17-19, 37-38 * ; para [0006], [0027], [0038], [0044], [0046], [0062] *; | [A]US2018168811 (RANGANATHAN SHIVAKUMAR IYER [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * ; see entire document *; | [XY]WO2019232589 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU]) [X] 1-4,6,8-15 * ; pg 1 In 14-15; pg 7 In 3, 12; pg 8 In 1-3, 17-19; pg 10 In 18-22, 28-29; pg 14 In 10-12; pg 15 In 16-17, 21-24; pg 18 In 12-14, 19; pg 29 In 26-27; pg 30 In 7-8; claim 16 * [Y] 5, 7, 16-38; | [Y] - ZHONG Xia, Dehghani Fariba, "Fabrication of biomimetic poly(propylene carbonate) scaffolds by using carbon dioxide as a solvent, monomer and foaming agent", Green Chemistry, (20120000), vol. 12, no. issue 9, doi:10.1039/C2GC35608B, pages 2523 - 2533, XP055844895 [Y] 16 * >; see entire document, especially, pg 2523-2524. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2gc35608b |