Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023087622 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062967310 | 29.01.2020 | US202117795329 | 28.01.2021 | WO2021US15411 | 28.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220133262 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062967310 | 29.01.2020 | WO2021US15411 | 28.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023512215 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062967310 | 29.01.2020 | WO2021US15411 | 28.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4096699 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | A4 | EP4096699 | 07.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062967310 | 29.01.2020 | WO2021US15411 | 28.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021154938 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062967310 | 29.01.2020 |