EP4096699 - BACTERIAL ADMIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Jackson Laboratory 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Julia 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Wei 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | 03 /
SPOTO, Michelle 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 21747277.8 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US15411 | Priority number, date | US202062967310P | 29.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062967310 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021154938 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096699 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61K8/99, A61K9/06, C07K19/00, A61K8/64, A61P17/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A61Q19/06 (EP);
A61K35/74 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/99 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (KR);
C12N1/20 (US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
A61K2800/5922 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/74, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | A61K38/17, A61K8/99, A61K9/06, A61K35/74, C07K19/00, A61K8/64, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | BAKTERIELLE BEIMENGUNGEN | [2022/49] | English: | BACTERIAL ADMIXTURES | [2022/49] | French: | MÉLANGES BACTÉRIENS | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018289751 (NAKATSUJI TERUAKI [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0067] * * paragraph [0117]; claims 1-3,10 * [I] 15; | [XAI] - MARTÍNEZ-GARCÍA SERGIO ET AL, "Competition/antagonism associations of biofilm formation amongStaphylococcus epidermidisAgr groups I, II, and III", THE JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, THE MICROBIOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF KOREA // HAN-GUG MISAENGMUL HAG-HOE, KR, vol. 57, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S12275-019-8322-5, ISSN 1225-8873, (20190131), pages 143 - 153, (20190131), XP036689844 [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * page 149 - page 150; table 4 * * page 145, column l, paragraph 2 * [A] 9-15 [I] 3,4,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12275-019-8322-5 | [X] - SORAYA CHERIFI ET AL, "Genetic characteristics and antimicrobial resistance of Staphylococcus epidermidis isolates from patients with catheter-related bloodstream infections and from colonized healthcare workers in a Belgian hospital", ANNALS OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY AND ANTIMICROBIALS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LPNDON, GB, (20140604), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1476-0711-13-20, ISSN 1476-0711, page 20, XP021189395 [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 6; tables 2,3 * * page 2, column r, paragraphs 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-0711-13-20 | [X] - SEAN CONLAN ET AL, "Staphylococcus epidermidis pan-genome sequence analysis reveals diversity of skin commensal and hospital infection-associated isolates", GENOME BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, (20120725), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1186/GB-2012-13-7-R64, ISSN 1465-6906, page R64, XP021138397 [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * page 2, column r, paragraph 3 - page 3, column r, paragraph 3; figure 3 * * page 9, column r, paragraph 2 - page 10, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/gb-2012-13-7-r64 | [T] - SCHOENFELDER S M K ET AL, "Success through diversity - How Staphylococcus epidermidis establishes as a nosocomial pathogen", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, URBAN UND FISCHER, DE, vol. 300, no. 6, ISSN 1438-4221, (20100801), pages 380 - 386, (20100801), XP027207249 [T] * abstract * | International search | [A]US2015328302 (CASTADO CINDY [BE], et al) [A] 1-6 * ; paragraphs [0215], [0244]-[0247]; claims 1 10, 17 *; | [A]WO2015184134 (AZITRA [US]) [A] 1-6 * ; page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 2; claims 11-12 *; | [A]WO2019046801 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-6 * ; paragraphs [0047], [0052], [00120], [00122]); figures 15, 20; claims 18-20 *; | [DA] - OLSON, ME et al., "Staphylococcus epidermidis agr Quorum-Sensing System: Signal Identification, Cross Talk, and Importance in Colonization", Journal of Bacteriology, (20141000), vol. 196, no. 19, doi:10.1128/JB.01882-14, pages 3482 - 3493, XP055470921 [DA] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.01882-14 | [PY] - Wei Zhou, Michelle Spoto, Rachel Hardy, Changhui Guan, Elizabeth Fleming, Peter J.Larson, Joseph S.Brown, Julia Oh, "Host-Specific Evolutionary and Transmission Dynamics Shape the Functional Diversification of Staphylococcus epidermidis in Human Skin", Cell, (20200206), vol. 180, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j. cell . 2020.01.00 6, pages 454 - 470, XP055846338 [PY] 1-6 |