EP4097200 - PROCESS OF PRODUCING MAGNESIUM SALTS OF PUFAS AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicycle Inc. 2500 Parc-Technologique Blvd Quebec City, Québec G1P 4S6 / CA | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Xiaowei 2500, boulevard du Parc-Technologique Québec, Québec G1P 4S6 / CA | 02 /
MELLON, Christophe 2500, boulevard du Parc-Technologique Québec, Québec G1P 4S6 / CA | 03 /
CARPENTIER, Claudia 2500, boulevard du Parc-Technologique Québec, Québec G1P 4S6 / CA | 04 /
PIGEON, Xavier 2500, boulevard du Parc-Technologique Québec, Québec G1P 4S6 / CA | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21747744.7 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021CA50095 | Priority number, date | US202062967666P | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062967666 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021151200 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4097200 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C11C1/00, A23L33/12, C11B5/00, C11C1/02, C11C1/08, A61K31/201, A61K31/202 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C11C1/025 (EP,IL,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,IL,US);
C11C1/005 (EP,IL);
C11C1/08 (EP,IL,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | C11C1/00, A23L33/12, C11B5/00, C11C1/02, C11C1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MAGNESIUMSALZEN VON PUFAS UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2022/49] | English: | PROCESS OF PRODUCING MAGNESIUM SALTS OF PUFAS AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SELS DE MAGNÉSIUM DE PUFA ET COMPOSITION LES CONTENANT | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007066232 (OCEAN NUTRITION CANADA LTD [CA], et al); | [A]CN101849960 (UNIV GUANGDONG OCEAN); | International search | [AY]EP1260496 (AGROMEDIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * , entire document * [Y] 17-26; | [Y]US2004236128 (RUBIN DAVID [US]) [Y] 17-26 * , entire document *; | [Y]WO2005108535 (NUTRISCIENCE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 17-26* , entire document *; | [Y]WO2018108975 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [Y] 17-26 * , entire document * |