EP4071163 - NUCLEIC ACID COMPLEX AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | ||
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd 4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Yuta C/O Eisai Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratories 5-1-3 Tokodai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP | 02 /
YAMAZAKI Kazuto C/O Eisai Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratories 5-1-3 Tokodai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP | 03 /
KUBARA Kenji C/O Eisai Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratories 5-1-3 Tokodai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP | 04 /
TAMURA Tomohiko c/o Public University Corporation Yokohama City University, 3-9, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 05 /
KUROTAKI Daisuke c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION KUMAMOTO UNIVERSITY, 39-1, Kurokami 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8555 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 21747841.1 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/41] | WO2021JP03085 | Priority number, date | JP20200013997 | 30.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020013997 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021153687 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071163 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/54, A61K48/00, A61K31/7088, C07K9/00, C12N15/11, C12N15/113 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
A61K47/549 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/351 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (EP);
C12N2310/341, C12N2310/3231 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | C07K9/00, A61K31/7088, A61K47/54, A61K48/00, C12N15/113 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | NUKLEINSÄUREKOMPLEX UND DIESEN ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/41] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID COMPLEX AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME | [2022/41] | French: | COMPLEXE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE LE CONTENANT | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2022 | Translation filed | 06.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2018004004 (KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-12 * compound 50 on page 123 * * compound 67 on page 128 * * compound 147 on page 155 * * compound 146 on page 157 * * compound 169 on page 160 * * compound 168 on page 162 * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0290] * * table 9 on page 129 * [A] 2; | [XAI]WO2018132432 (ARROWHEAD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,7-12 * table 7 * * page 76, line 5 - line 8 * * page 94, line 5 - line 7 * * page 95, line 24 - line 31 * * page 111, line 1 - line 2 * [A] 2 [I] 4-6; | [XAI] - THAZHA P. PRAKASH ET AL, "Comprehensive Structure-Activity Relationship of Triantennary N -Acetylgalactosamine Conjugated Antisense Oligonucleotides for Targeted Delivery to Hepatocytes", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20160324), vol. 59, no. 6, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b01948, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2718 - 2733, XP055394434 [X] 1,4,6,10-12 * figure 2 * * figure 4 * * figure 9 * * page 2724, column left, paragraph 4 * * page 2724, column right, paragraph 2 * [A] 2 [I] 5,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b01948 | International search | [XY]WO2015042447 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 2,15-23 * 1-235, p.50, 1.8 to p. 76, 1.13, Ex.29, Ex32, Ex33, Ex.37 * [Y] 2,8-23; | [XY]JP2016526874 [X] 2,15-23 * 1-242, 507-509,528-533 * [Y] 2,8-23; | [XY]WO2018140920 (ARROWHEAD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 2,12,16-23 * 1-25, p.83, 1.5 to p.87, 1.11, p.93 * [Y] 2,8-23; | [A]WO2018187515 (AVIDEA TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3-7,15-23* 341, 359, 363, 30, 32, 35,37, 41-43 * | by applicant | WO2009073809 | WO2013075035 | WO2014179620 | WO2015105083 | WO2016100401 | WO2018004004 | - Nature Reviews Drug Discovery, (20090000), vol. 8, pages 129 - 138 | - J.Am. Chem. Soc., (20140000), vol. 136, pages 16958 - 16961 | - Nucleic Acids Research, (20190000), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 1082 - 1096 |