EP4096703 - THERAPEUTIC USES OF TIRZEPATIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46206-6288 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COGHLAN, Matthew Paul c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 02 /
HAUPT, Axel c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Masahiro c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 04 /
RIESMEYER, Jeffrey Scott c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Bassinder, Emma Marie Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21748068.0 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021US14535 | Priority number, date | US202062967867P | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062967867 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021154593 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096703 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, A61K38/16, A61K38/00, A61P7/00, A61P25/28, A61P3/10 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | A61K38/26, A61K38/16, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN VON TIRZEPATID | [2022/49] | English: | THERAPEUTIC USES OF TIRZEPATIDE | [2022/49] | French: | UTILISATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES DE TIRZÉPATIDE | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US9474780 (BOKVIST BENGT KRISTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2020023040 (BENSON CHARLES T [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [YP]WO2020261205 (PFIZER [US]) [YP] 1-25 * page 20; claim 10 *; | [T]WO2022271611 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [T] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [Y] - BASTIN MARIE ET AL, DIABETES, METABOLIC SYNDROME AND OBESITY: TARGETS AND THERAPY, Volume 12, doi:10.2147/DMSO.S191438, (20190930), pages 1973 - 1985, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6777434/pdf/dmso-12-1973.pdf, XP055797753 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/DMSO.S191438 | [Y] - TAMER COSKUN ET AL, "LY3298176, a novel dual GIP and GLP-1 receptor agonist for the treatment of type 2 diabetes mellitus: From discovery to clinical proof of concept", MOLECULAR METABOLISM, vol. 18, doi:10.1016/j.molmet.2018.09.009, ISSN 2212-8778, (20181003), pages 3 - 14, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S2212877818309001, XP055567725 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmet.2018.09.009 | [Y] - JUAN PABLO FRIAS ET AL, "Efficacy and safety of LY3298176, a novel dual GIP and GLP-1 receptor agonist, in patients with type 2 diabetes: a randomised, placebo-controlled and active comparator-controlled phase 2 trial", THE LANCET, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20181004), vol. 392, no. 10160, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(18)32260-8, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 2180 - 2193, XP055567738 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(18)32260-8 | [Y] - SHI LIJUAN ET AL, "A novel dual GLP-1/GIP receptor agonist alleviates cognitive decline by re-sensitizing insulin signaling in the Alzheimer icv. STZ rat model", BEHAVIOURAL BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170323), vol. 327, doi:10.1016/J.BBR.2017.03.032, ISSN 0166-4328, pages 65 - 74, XP029987762 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbr.2017.03.032 | [Y] - Holscher Holscher Christian Christian ET AL, "Novel dual GLP-1/GIP receptor agonists show neuroprotective effects in Alzheimer's and Parkinson's disease models", Neuropharmacology, England, doi:10.1016/j.neuropharm.2018.01.040, (20180701), pages 251 - 259, URL: https://eprints.lancs.ac.uk/id/eprint/90173/1/Holscher_review.pdf, (20230526), XP093049997 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuropharm.2018.01.040 | [Y] - Nct03861052, "Clinical Study Protocol Amendment Version (a) I8F-JE-GPGO A Phase 3 Study of Tirzepatide Monotherapy Compared to Dulaglutide 0.75 mg in Patients with Type 2 Diabetes Mellitus (SURPASS J-mono)", (20190117), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ProvidedDocs/52/NCT03861052/Prot_000.pdf, (20230526), XP093049999 [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2020023040 (BENSON CHARLES T [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 7 * , Abstract, para [0001], [0004], [0005], [0007], (0048], [0117], [0250], and [0582] *; | [Y] - Saedi Elham, Gheini Mohammad Reza, Faiz Firoozeh, Arami Mohammad Ali, "Diabetes mellitus and cognitive impairments", World Journal of Diabetes, (20160915), vol. 7, no. 17, doi:10.4239/wjd.v7.i17.412, ISSN 1948-9358, pages 412 - 422, XP055845189 [Y] 1-5, 7 * . Abstract; pg 412, col 2, last para; pg 413, col 2, para 5 and last para; pg 415, col 1, para 3; and pg 416, col 1, para 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4239/wjd.v7.i17.412 | [A] - BASTIN et al., "Dual GIP-GLP1-Receptor Agonists In The Treatment Of Type 2 Diabetes: A Short Review On Emerging Data And Therapeutic Potential", Diabetes Metab Syndr Obes, (20190000), vol. 12, doi:10.2147/DMSO.S191438, pages 1973 - 1985, XP055797753 [A] 1-5, 7 * . Entire documentation especially Abstract; pg 1976, Fig 1; pg 1977, Fig 2; pg 1979, Table 1; and pg 1981, col 2, lower para and Table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/DMSO.S191438 | [A] - COSKUN et al., "LY3298176, a novel dual GIP and GLP-1 receptor agonist for the treatment of type 2 diabetes mellitus: From discovery to clinical proof of concept", Mol Metab., (20180000), vol. 18, doi:10.1016/j.molmet.2018.09.009, pages 3 - 14, XP055567725 [A] 1-5, 7 * . Entire documentation especially Abstract; and pg 6, Fig 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmet.2018.09.009 | [A] - MATHIESEN et al., "The Eects of Dual GLP-1/GIP Receptor Agonism on Glucagon Secretion - A Review", Int J Mol Sci., (20190000), vol. 20, no. 17, doi:10.3390/ijms20174092, page 4092, XP055737135 [A] 1-5, 7 * . PDF File: pg 1-18. Abstract; pg 8, para 5 and last para; pg 9; and pg 10, para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms20174092 | [AP] - WILLARD et al., "Tirzepatide is an imbalanced and biased dual GIP and GLP-1 receptor agonist", JCI Insight, (20200903), vol. 5, no. 17, page e140532, XP055845216 [AP] 1-5,7 * . PDF File: pg 1-16. Entire documentation especially Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/jci.insight.140532 |