Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
06.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
31.03.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
25.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.11.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
04.11.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
10.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.06.2022 | Change - representative | |
01.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.08.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |