Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023192679 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217984723 | 10.11.2022 | US202217711645 | 01.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023400448 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117160366 | 27.01.2021 | US202318455452 | 24.08.2023 | US202062966484 | 27.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023312191 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217711645 | 01.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023061233 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217984723 | 10.11.2022 | US202117160366 | 27.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11761946 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | B2 | US2021231634 | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117160366 | 27.01.2021 | US202062966484 | 27.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3163331 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US15342 | 27.01.2021 | US202062966484 | 27.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022203082 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217711645 | 01.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021202232 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US15342 | 27.01.2021 | US202062966484 | 27.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4097444 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | A4 | EP4097444 | 07.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US15342 | 27.01.2021 | US202062966484 | 27.01.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021154896 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062966484 | 27.01.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2022001751 | 31.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062966484 | 27.01.2020 |