EP4186324 - RELEASING USER PLANE RESOURCES OF A DATA CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. 151, Lorong Chuan 02-01 New Tech Park 556741 / SG | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELEV, Genadi 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
BASU MALLICK, Prateek 63303 Dreieich / DE | 03 /
KUCHIBHOTLA, Ravi Chicago, Illinois 60680 / US | 04 /
CHOI, Hyung-Nam 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21748961.6 | 23.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021IB56683 | Priority number, date | US202063055852P | 23.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063055852 P | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022018700 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186324 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/25, H04W76/34 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04W76/25 (EP);
H04W76/36 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W76/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | FREIGABE VON RESSOURCEN AUF BENUTZEREBENE EINER DATENVERBINDUNG | [2023/22] | English: | RELEASING USER PLANE RESOURCES OF A DATA CONNECTION | [2023/22] | French: | LIBÉRATION DE RESSOURCES DE PLAN UTILISATEUR D'UNE CONNEXION DE DONNÉES | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 10.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "TS 23.501 -Handling of PDU sessions at slice unavailability", vol. SA WG2, no. San Jose Del Cabo, Mexico; 20170626 - 20170630, (20170625), pages 1 - 2, 3GPP DRAFT; S2-174444_TS 23.501 SLICING PDU SESSION HANDLING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA2/Docs/, (20170625), XP051303295 [I] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * |