Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4172118 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202180046924 EP21749394 JP2022579749 KR20237002906 US2021039344W US202117358961



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2021403368Global Dossier 30.12.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202063046482 30.06.2020
US202117358961 25.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20230031902Global Dossier 07.03.2023A
Priority number Date
US202063046482 30.06.2020
WO2021US39344 28.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2023531525Global Dossier 24.07.2023A
Priority number Date
US202063046482 30.06.2020
WO2021US39344 28.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115996896Global Dossier 21.04.2023A
Priority number Date
US202063046482 30.06.2020
WO2021US39344 28.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4172118Global Dossier 03.05.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202063046482 30.06.2020
WO2021US39344 28.06.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022005956Global Dossier 06.01.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202063046482 30.06.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202204279 01.02.2022A
Priority number Date
US202063046482 30.06.2020