EP4179649 - RECEIVER AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORTING AND DEMODULATING COMPLEX OPTICAL SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOWALEVICZ, Andrew Sterling, VA 20166 / US | 02 /
DOLGIN, Benjamin P. Sterling, VA 20166 / US | 03 /
GRACEFFO, Gary M. Sterling, VA 20166 / US | 04 /
TALAMONTI, James Dulles, VA 20166 / US | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21749477.2 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021US41055 | Priority number, date | US202063050388P | 10.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063050388 P | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022011240 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179649 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/67, H04J14/04 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H04B10/676 (EP,US);
H04B10/6165 (US);
H04B10/615 (US);
H04B10/65 (US);
H04B10/67 (US);
H04J14/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | EMPFÄNGER UND SYSTEM ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN UND DEMODULIEREN KOMPLEXER OPTISCHER SIGNALE | [2023/20] | English: | RECEIVER AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORTING AND DEMODULATING COMPLEX OPTICAL SIGNALS | [2023/20] | French: | RÉCEPTEUR ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT ET DE DÉMODULATION DE SIGNAUX OPTIQUES COMPLEXES | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2521289 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [I]US2019280780 (GRACEFFO GARY M [US], et al); | [I]US2019319714 (KOWALEVICZ ANDREW [US], et al); |