EP4179191 - SYSTEMS AND METODS OF CYLINDER DEACTIVATION IN HIGH-TEMPERATURE MIXING-CONTROLLED ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clearflame Engines, Inc. 2633 Kaneville Ct. Geneva, IL 60134 / US | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUMREITER, Julie Batavia, Illinois 60510 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Bernard Chicago, Illinois 60605 / US | 03 /
SCHANZ, Robert Aurora, Illinois 60502 / US | 04 /
VITTAL, Manohar Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21749485.5 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021US41109 | Priority number, date | US202063049763P | 09.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063049763 P | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022011275 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179191 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D13/06, F02D41/30 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
F02D13/06 (EP,US);
F02D41/0055 (EP);
F02D41/1454 (EP,US);
F02D41/1475 (EP,US);
F01N3/101 (EP);
F02B1/12 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
F02D2200/1002 (EP);
F02D2200/101 (EP,US);
F02D2200/602 (US);
F02D41/0025 (EP);
F02D41/0027 (EP);
F02D41/3035 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZYLINDERABSCHALTUNG IN MISCHGESTEUERTEN HOCHTEMPERATURMOTOREN | [2023/20] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METODS OF CYLINDER DEACTIVATION IN HIGH-TEMPERATURE MIXING-CONTROLLED ENGINES | [2023/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉSACTIVATION DE CYLINDRES DANS DES MOTEURS À RÉGULATION DE MÉLANGE À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 03.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007204830 (ANDRI MICHAEL [US]); | [A]US2012204832 (BAUR ANDREW W [US], et al); | [XI]WO2016118482 (EATON CORP [US]); | [XI]US2017370308 (HASHEMI SIAMAK [US], et al); | [A]EP3336336 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP3524800 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | US7954474 | US8511281 | US9903262 | US2021054777 | WO2021US19930 |