EP4196314 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TEMPERATURE-CRITICAL JOINING OF TWO COMPONENT LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANTEL, Christoph 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
SCHWINDT, Emilia 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
EISENREICH, Nathanael 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21749631.4 | 27.07.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021EP71035 | Priority number, date | DE202010210201 | 12.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020210201 | [2023/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033869 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4196314 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/21, B23K26/32, H01R43/02, H01L23/00, H05K3/32, B23K101/40, B23K103/10, B23K103/12 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B23K26/21 (EP);
B23K26/32 (EP);
H05K3/32 (EP);
H05K3/328 (EP);
B23K2101/40 (EP);
B23K2103/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TEMPERATURKRITISCHEN FÜGEN ZWEIER BAUTEILSCHICHTEN | [2023/25] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TEMPERATURE-CRITICAL JOINING OF TWO COMPONENT LAYERS | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE À TEMPÉRATURE CRITIQUE DE DEUX COUCHES DE COMPOSANT | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2144284 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0017]; figure 1; claims 1,7 *; | [X]DE102014116283 (WEBASTO SE [DE]) [X] 1,4-7* paragraphs [0001] , [0033] - [0044]; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2020045263 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0036] , [0045] - [0050] - [0062] - [0066] - [0075] , [0085] , [0118] , [0124] , [0130]; claims 8,20,26 * |