EP4094453 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING LOCATION OF MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hang 24 Gardengate Way Nepean, Ontario K2G 5Z1 / CA | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21750040.4 | 06.02.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021CN75683 | Priority number, date | US202062971102P | 06.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062971102 P | US202117167918 | 04.02.2021 Original published format: US202117167918 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155856 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094453 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4094453 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W4/023 (EP);
H04W4/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, GERÄT UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING LOCATION OF MOBILE DEVICE | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION D'EMPLACEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 20.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3352486 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [XI]WO2019027245 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]CN109842934 (BEIJING SAMSUNG TELECOM R&D CT, et al) | International search | [A]US2001034239 (YAMATO KATSUMI [JP], et al); | [A]US2002025824 (LIN CHING-FANG [US]); | [A]CN104796865 (UNIV ZHEJIANG); | [X]CN106646573 (CHINA AVIATION MARINE EQUIPMENT (YANTAI) TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN109451580 (UNIV NANKAI) | by applicant | WO2019027245 |