blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4101365

EP4101365 - IMAGE-PROCESSING DEVICE, ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM, AND IMAGE-PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.11.2022
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.08.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 106-8620 / JP
[2022/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WATANABE, Hiroki
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-
machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP
 [2022/50]
Representative(s)Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB
Theresienstraße 6-8
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2022/50]Jeffrey, Philip Michael
Dehns Germany
Theresienstraße 6-8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date21750428.122.01.2021
[2022/50]
WO2021JP02286
Priority number, dateJP2020001980307.02.2020         Original published format: JP 2020019803
[2022/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021157392
Date:12.08.2021
Language:JA
[2021/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4101365
Date:14.12.2022
Language:EN
[2022/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.08.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2023
ClassificationIPC:A61B1/045, G16H30/40, G16H40/63, G16H50/20, G16H50/30, G16H50/70, A61B1/00, A61B1/06, G06T7/00
[2023/31]
CPC:
G06T7/0012 (EP,US); A61B1/000094 (EP); A61B1/000096 (EP,US);
A61B1/0005 (EP); A61B1/0638 (EP); G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP); G16H50/20 (EP); G16H50/30 (EP);
G16H50/70 (EP); A61B1/00188 (EP); G06T2207/10016 (EP);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,US); G06T2207/20081 (EP,US); G06T2207/30028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30101 (US); G06T2207/30168 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2022/50]A61B1/045
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/50]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ENDOSKOPISCHES SYSTEM UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN[2022/50]
English:IMAGE-PROCESSING DEVICE, ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM, AND IMAGE-PROCESSING METHOD[2022/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, SYSTÈME ENDOSCOPIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE[2022/50]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2022Translation filed 
04.08.2022National basic fee paid 
04.08.2022Search fee paid 
04.08.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2022Examination requested  [2022/50]
29.01.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2018214005  (EBATA TETSURO [JP])
International search[Y]JP2006122502  (OLYMPUS CORP);
 [Y]JP2006288612  (OLYMPUS CORP);
 [Y]JP2009050321  (OLYMPUS CORP);
 [Y]US9324145  (CHEREVATSKY BORIS [IL], et al);
 [XY]JP2016144626  (FUJIFILM CORP);
 [Y]JP2016214637  (HOYA CORP);
 [XY]WO2017057574  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]);
 [XY]WO2017057414  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]);
 [Y]JP2019037688  (FUJIFILM CORP);
by applicantJP2019111040
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.