EP4102338 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING POSITION OF USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UHM, Junwhon 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jaewon 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Yunguk 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21750467.9 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021KR01215 | Priority number, date | KR20200013750 | 05.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200013750 | [2022/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021157964 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102338 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H04B5/00, // G01S5/16 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06F1/163 (EP,KR);
G02B27/017 (KR);
G06F1/1686 (EP,KR);
G06F1/1698 (EP,KR);
H04B5/72 (EP);
H04W4/02 (KR);
G01S5/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | G06F1/16, H04W4/02, G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG DER POSITION EINES BENUTZERS | [2022/50] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING POSITION OF USER | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR LA POSITION D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | Translation filed | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 12.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014118631 (CHO EUNHYUNG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] ** figures 1-8 *; | [I]US2015097719 (BALACHANDRESWARAN DHANUSHAN [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0098] * * figures 1-5, 26, 27 * | International search | [Y]KR20140054611 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 5,13; | [A]KR101669520B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0116]-[0136]; and figures 4-5. *; | [A]US2018093177 (TOKUBO TODD [US]) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-7. *; | [Y]KR20190029052 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5,13 * See paragraphs [0060] and [0076]; and figures 4a-4b. *; | [A]KR20190110859 (DESIGN APOINT [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0026] and [0037]-[0054]; and figures 1 and 3. * |