EP4098066 - UE CAPABILITY SIGNALING TO SUPPORT ENHANCEMENTS OF A RANDOM ACCESS OPERATION FOR 5G NEW RADIO (NR) IN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM (NR-U) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Chiou-Wei No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City, 30078 / TW | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21750878.7 | 05.02.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021CN75456 | Priority number, date | US202062970791P | 06.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062970791 P | US202063014813P | 24.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063014813 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155837 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098066 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24, H04W48/12, // H04W36/00, H04W72/51 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W8/205 (US);
H04J13/0062 (US);
H04W36/0066 (US);
H04W48/14 (US);
H04W72/51 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄTEFÄHIGKEITSSIGNALISIERUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ERWEITERUNGEN EINES DIREKTZUGRIFFSVORGANGS FÜR 5G-NEUFUNK (NR) IM UNLIZENZIERTEN SPEKTRUM (NR-U) | [2022/49] | English: | UE CAPABILITY SIGNALING TO SUPPORT ENHANCEMENTS OF A RANDOM ACCESS OPERATION FOR 5G NEW RADIO (NR) IN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM (NR-U) | [2022/49] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE LA CAPACITÉ D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR À PRENDRE EN CHARGE DES AMÉLIORATIONS D'UNE OPÉRATION D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE POUR NOUVELLE RADIO 5G (NR) DANS UN SPECTRE SANS LICENCE (NR-U) | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP3054737 (HTC CORP [TW]); | [YA]EP3429245 (SHARP KK [JP]); | International search | [A]CN107148803 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-20 * The whole document *; | [A]US2017339702 (ZHAO QINGLIN [MO], et al) [A] 1-20* The whole document *; | [X]EP3407662 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1-20 * description paragraphs [0019]-[0029] *; | [A]US2020014569 (HUANG YI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * The whole document * | by applicant | EP3054737 |