Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021155838 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023388779 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318232814 | 10.08.2023 | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | US202117190771 | 03.03.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023008553 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217902827 | 03.09.2022 | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | WO2021CN75457 | 05.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022418009 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217902826 | 03.09.2022 | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | WO2021CN75456 | 05.02.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11770696 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | B2 | US2021306843 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | US202117190771 | 03.03.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11528595 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | B2 | US2021250752 | 12.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202117148135 | 13.01.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4098051 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | A4 | EP4098051 | 07.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | WO2021CN75457 | 05.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115380601 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | WO2021CN75457 | 05.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115336375 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | WO2021CN75456 | 05.02.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113453217B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2024 | B | CN113453217 | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | US202117190771 | 03.03.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113225730B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2024 | B | CN113225730 | 06.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202117148135 | 13.01.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4098066 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | A4 | EP4098066 | 07.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | WO2021CN75456 | 05.02.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI747732B | 21.11.2021 | B | TW202131719 | 16.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202117148135 | 13.01.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI770884B | 11.07.2022 | B | TW202139628 | 16.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202063000539 | 27.03.2020 | US202117190771 | 03.03.2021 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021155837 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062970791 | 06.02.2020 | US202063014813 | 24.04.2020 |