EP4100690 - EMBEDDED TARGET TRACKING TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bae Systems Hägglunds Aktiebolag 891 82 Örnsköldsvik / SE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Johan Smed-Andersväg 11 892 42 Domsjö / SE | 02 /
FOSSUM SJÖDIN, Karin Västeralnäs 221 894 91 Själevad / SE | 03 /
WÅGBERG, Jerker Nygatan 49 A 891 34 Örnsköldsvik / SE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21751073.4 | 01.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021SE50074 | Priority number, date | SE20200050112 | 03.02.2020 Original published format: SE 2050112 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021158159 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100690 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/26, G09B9/042, F41A33/00, F41H7/02, F41G3/22 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
F41A33/00 (EP,IL,KR);
F41G3/26 (EP,IL,KR);
F41G3/2694 (US);
F41G3/22 (EP);
F41G5/00 (IL,KR);
F41H7/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G09B9/042 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | F41G3/26, G09B9/042, F41A33/00, F41H7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | TRAINIEREN DER VERFOLGUNG EINES EINGEBETTETEN ZIELS | [2022/50] | English: | EMBEDDED TARGET TRACKING TRAINING | [2022/50] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE DE SUIVI DE CIBLE INTÉGRÉ | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3691284 (BORJESON JAN LENNART); | [Y]US4521196 (BRIARD RENE [FR], et al); | [IY]DE19606685 (INDUSTRIEANLAGEN BETRIEBSGES [DE]) | International search | [A]GB2017276 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-12 * ; abstract; page 1, line 60 - line 86; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4639222 (VISHLIZKY YORAM [IL]) [A] 1-12 * ; abstract; column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]CA2266915 (DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO [DE]) [A] 1-12 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0001 ]-[0005]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2014060971 (SELEX ES SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12* ; abstract; page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2018356187 (CLERMONT BERNARD [BE], et al) [X] 1, 3-6, 11-12 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0025]-[0028], [0037]-[0039], [0052]-[0054] * |