EP4101233 - PRE-EMPTION MANAGEMENT IN SIDELINK TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JRD Communication (Shenzhen) Ltd 8/F, Block F4, TCL Tower TCL International E City 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road Xili Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALIM, Umer 8/F, Block F4, TCL Tower, TCL International E City, 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road, Xili Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21751189.8 | 05.02.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021CN75628 | Priority number, date | US202062971133P | 06.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062971133 P | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155848 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101233 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/25 (US);
H04W72/54 (US);
H04W72/563 (US);
H04W72/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | PRÄEMPTIONSVERWALTUNG IN SIDELINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2022/50] | English: | PRE-EMPTION MANAGEMENT IN SIDELINK TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS | [2022/50] | French: | GESTION DE PRÉEMPTION DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON LATÉRALE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 26.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015176633 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]CN108024266 (BEIJING XINWEI TELECOM TECH INC) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019066629 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [X]EP3550905 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1, 6, 7, 9, 10, 14-20 * the description, paragraphs [0026]-[0168] *; | [A]WO2020009431 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-35 * the whole document * |