EP4101234 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RANDOM ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Zhipeng No. 32, Chi Tian Road, Jiangning Development Zone Nanjing, Jiangsu 211100 / CN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21751261.5 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021CN74110 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN74528 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/074528 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155757 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101234 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4101234 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04L27/26, H04W76/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W74/085 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0062 (US);
H04L5/0091 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIREKTZUGRIFF | [2022/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RANDOM ACCESS | [2022/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 31.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24161014.6 / EP4369843 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019349968 (YERRAMALLI SRINIVAS [US], et al); | [A]CN110603760 (MEDIATEK INC); | [X]CN110740516 (KT CORP) |