Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4100020 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4100020



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(28)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 129
16.10.2024 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.10.2024 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.10.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.10.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.10.2024 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
09.07.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.07.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.07.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.07.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
09.07.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.01.2024 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.12.2023 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.12.2023 European search opinion Search / examination 4
22.12.2023 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
22.12.2023 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
04.12.2023 Search started Search / examination 1
16.11.2022 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.09.2022 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
01.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.09.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
01.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.09.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
01.09.2022 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.08.2022 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
20.06.2022 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.08.2021 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
12.08.2021 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
12.08.2021 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 28