EP4182024 - USE OF CANNABIDIOL IN THE TREATMENT OF SEIZURES ASSOCIATED WITH MUTATIONS IN THE SYNGAP1 GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GW Research Limited Sovereign House Vision Park Chivers Way Histon Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB24 9BZ / GB | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHECKETTS, Daniel, Adam Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB24 9BZ / GB | 02 /
CRAIG, Kevin, James Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB24 9BZ / GB | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21751515.4 | 15.07.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021EP69877 | Priority number, date | GB20200011175 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: GB 202011175 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022017942 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4182024 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/08, A61K45/00, A61K31/05, A61K31/19, A61K31/352 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A61P25/08 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,GB);
A61K31/658 (US);
A61K31/185 (US);
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K31/53 (US);
A61K36/185 (GB);
A61K45/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CANNABIDIOL BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ANFÄLLEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT MUTATIONEN IM SYNGAP1-GEN | [2023/21] | English: | USE OF CANNABIDIOL IN THE TREATMENT OF SEIZURES ASSOCIATED WITH MUTATIONS IN THE SYNGAP1 GENE | [2023/21] | French: | UTILISATION DE CANNABIDIOL DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE CRISES ASSOCIÉES À DES MUTATIONS DANS LE GÈNE SYNGAP1 | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 16.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017231923 (GUY GEOFFREY [GB], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 99] * * claims 1-22 *; | [Y]WO2019207319 (GW RES LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-43 *; | [XPYI]WO2021055499 (ZYNERBA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [XP] 14 * claims 1-17 * * example 2; tables 2, 5 * [Y] 1-14[I] 1-14; | [XYI] - KUCHENBUCH MATHIEU ET AL, "Add-on cannabidiol significantly decreases seizures in 3 patients with SYNGAP1 developmental and epileptic encephalopathy", EPILEPSIA OPEN, vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1002/epi4.12411, ISSN 2470-9239, (20200604), pages 496 - 500, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/epi4.12411, XP055847803 [X] 14 * abstract * * figure 1; table 1 * * 4. Discussion * [Y] 1-14 [I] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/epi4.12411 | [XYI] - VLASKAMP DANIQUE R.M. ET AL, "SYNGAP1 encephalopathy. A distinctive generalized developmental and epileptic encephalopathy", NEUROLOGY, US, vol. 92, no. 2, doi:10.1212/WNL.0000000000006729, ISSN 0028-3878, (20190108), pages e96 - e107, URL: https://n.neurology.org/content/neurology/92/2/e96.full.pdf, XP055808006 [X] 14 * page e102, section "Epilepsy treatment and outcome";; figure 5 * [Y] 1-14 [I] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1212/WNL.0000000000006729 | by applicant | - ROGER PERTWEE, Handbook of Cannabis, pages 3 - 15 |