Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023285422 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202011175 | 20.07.2020 | WO2021EP69877 | 15.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4182024 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202011175 | 20.07.2020 | WO2021EP69877 | 15.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022017942 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202011175 | 20.07.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2597322 | 26.01.2022 | A | GB202011175D0 | 02.09.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202011175 | 20.07.2020 |