EP4204718 - PLASTIC PART WITH AN INTERNAL THREAD AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestraße 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOB, Lukas 96172 Mühlhausen / DE | 02 /
GILMER, Juergen 91462 Rauschenberg / DE | 03 /
HACHMANN, Sven 91056 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
DRESSEL, Robert 91350 Gremsdorf / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21751970.1 | 28.07.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021DE100648 | Priority number, date | DE202010122372 | 27.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020122372 | [2023/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022042791 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204718 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/24, B21D53/24, B29C45/26 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
F16H25/24 (EP);
B29C45/2612 (EP);
B29C45/262 (EP);
B29C45/2681 (EP);
B29L2001/005 (EP);
F16H2025/249 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFTEIL MIT EINEM INNENGEWINDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KUNSTSTOFFTEILS | [2023/27] | English: | PLASTIC PART WITH AN INTERNAL THREAD AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC PART | [2023/27] | French: | PIÈCE EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE POURVUE D'UN FILETAGE INTÉRIEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PIÈCE EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |