EP4188123 - CONSUMABLE FOR AN AEROSOL PROVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | 06.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLFORD, Steven London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
LEAH, Thomas London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21752125.1 | 30.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021GB51973 | Priority number, date | GB20200011953 | 31.07.2020 Original published format: GB 202011953 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022023763 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188123 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/12, A24B15/16, A24B15/28, A24D3/02, A24D3/06, A24D3/16, A24D3/17, A24D3/10 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
A24D3/067 (EP,IL,US);
A24D1/20 (EP,IL,US);
A24B15/12 (EP,IL,US);
A24B15/16 (EP,IL);
A24B15/281 (EP,IL);
A24D3/10 (EP,IL);
A24D3/16 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | VERBRAUCHSMATERIAL FÜR EIN AEROSOLBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/23] | English: | CONSUMABLE FOR AN AEROSOL PROVISION SYSTEM | [2023/23] | French: | CONSOMMABLE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'AÉROSOL | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 10.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0545186 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-17,22,24,26-28,30 * the whole document * [I] 6,9,29; | [X]WO2018019578 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1-3,11-18,22-24,26 * the whole document * * figure 1, *; | [X]WO2019077083 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,2,15-21,23,27,30 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2020025730 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-19,22-24,26,30 * the whole document * [I] 6,9; | [A]WO2020025722 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]) [A] 3,6-17,27* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2020074494 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,15-22,24-28,30 * the whole document * * figures 1-7 * [I] 6,9,29; | [X]WO2020089078 (NERUDIA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,13,16-21,23-27,30 * the whole document * * figures 1-4 *; | [XP]EP3735842 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [XP] 1,2,4,5,11-15,18,22-24,26,28 * the whole document * * figures 1-11,18,19,20 *; | [XP]WO2021118186 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [XP] 1-4,11,13,15,17-20,22,24,26,28-30 * the whole document * * figures 1-6 * |