EP4370718 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING OF A STEEL PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORT, Pierrick 57640 Saint Hubert / FR | 02 /
NADLER, Aude 57000 Metz 57000 Metz / FR | 03 /
ZHU, Kangying 57000 Metz / FR | 04 /
PERLADE, Astrid 57050 Le Ban-Saint-Martin / FR | 05 /
SOLER, Michel 57530 Ars Laquenexy / FR | 06 /
KEGEL, Frédéric 57970 YUTZ / FR | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal France Research & Development Intellectual Property 6, rue André Campra, Immeuble Le Cézanne 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 21752758.9 | 16.07.2021 | [2024/21] | WO2021IB56448 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023285867 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4370718 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/26, C21D6/00, C21D8/02, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/22, C22C38/38, C22C38/34 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,KR);
C21D9/46 (US);
C21D1/26 (EP,KR);
C21D6/005 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0273 (US);
C22C38/001 (KR,US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP,KR);
C22C38/34 (EP,KR);
C21D2211/001 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | 16.02.2024 | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STAHLTEILS | [2024/21] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING OF A STEEL PART | [2024/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIÈCE EN ACIER | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019040489 (HASEGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2020032362 (HASEGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2020362432 (JUNG CORALIE [FR], et al); | [A]US2021115528 (MAGAR CORALIE [FR], et al); | [A]WO2021123888 (ARCELORMITTAL [LU]) | by applicant | WO2017131052 |