|
05.12.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2023 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2023 |
Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2023 |
Request for correction of client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
15.06.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
02.06.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2023 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.04.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2023 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2022 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.11.2022 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2022 |
|
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2022 |
|
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2022 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.05.2022 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.05.2022 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.05.2022 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2022 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2022 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.02.2022 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.09.2021 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.08.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2021 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2021 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2021 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
20 |