30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
20.10.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
14.10.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.06.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
02.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
02.06.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
14.04.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
14.04.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
14.04.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
27.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.12.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
25.11.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
25.11.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
29.04.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
29.04.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
24.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.02.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
28.02.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|