Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022379274 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN71151 | 12.01.2021 | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102684463B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | B1 | KR20220070007 | 27.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN71151 | 12.01.2021 | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7460759B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | B2 | JP2022550677 | 05.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN71151 | 12.01.2021 | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4005662 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2023 | B1 | EP4005662 | 28.12.2022 | A4 | EP4005662 | 01.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN71151 | 12.01.2021 | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2968089T | 07.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN71151 | 12.01.2021 | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021159900 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111249941B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | B | CN111249941 | 09.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE064562T | 28.04.2024 | T2 | Priority number | Date | CN202010085377 | 10.02.2020 |