EP4103688 - USE OF MICROBIAL CELL LINES TO MAXIMIZE ORGANIC ACID PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S & P Ingredient Development, LLC 600 Highway 169 South Suite 885 St. Louis Park MN 55426 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Derrick Nutek Food Science Beadle Center 1901 Vine Street Lincoln, Nebraska 68503-0666 / US | 02 /
BROPHY, James S. 600 Highway 169 South, Suite 885 St. Louis Park, Minnesota 55426 / US | 03 /
PITCHAI, Krishnamoorthy 600 Highway 169 South, Suite 885 St. Louis Park, Minnesota 55426 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21753482.5 | 12.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021US17940 | Priority number, date | US202062977087P | 14.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062977087 P | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021163548 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4103688 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12P7/52, C12P7/56, C12P39/00, C12P7/46, C12P7/54 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
C12P7/56 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12P39/00 (EP,US);
C12P7/46 (EP,US);
C12P7/52 (EP,KR);
C12P7/54 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | C12N1/20, C12N1/36, C12N15/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MIKROBIELLEN ZELLINIEN ZUR MAXIMIERUNG DER PRODUKTION VON ORGANISCHEN SÄUREN | [2022/51] | English: | USE OF MICROBIAL CELL LINES TO MAXIMIZE ORGANIC ACID PRODUCTION | [2022/51] | French: | UTILISATION DE LIGNÉES CELLULAIRES MICROBIENNES POUR MAXIMISER LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE ORGANIQUE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 14.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1932755 (STILES HUGH R, et al) [X] 1-5 * claims 4-6,14-16 * [I] 6-15; | [XDI]WO8504901 (IGI BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [XD] 1-4 * pages 1-5; claim 3 * [I] 5-15; | [X]US2004033289 (SELMER-OLSEN EIRIK [NO]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X] - TANIGUCHI MASAYUKI, "Production of a mixture of antimicrobial organic acids from lactose by co-culture of Bifidobacterium longum and Propionibacterium freudenreichii", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM, (19980101), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 1522 - 1527, XP055878699 [X] 1-15 * page 1522 - page 1523 * * page 1525 * | [XI] - BORDER P M ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF PROPIONIC ACID BY MIXED BACTERIAL FERMENTATION", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, (19870101), vol. 9, no. 12, doi:10.1007/BF01026193, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 843 - 848, XP008069041 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01026193 | International search | [A]US1932755 (STILES HUGH R, et al) [A] 1-4,21 * entirety of document *; | [X]US2004033289 (SELMER-OLSEN EIRIK [NO]) [X] 1-4,21 * entirety of document especially Abstract; para [0026]-[0030]; [0037]; Figs. 2, 5 *; | [A]US2017145467 (SVAGELJ MIRJAN [SI], et al) [A] 1-4,21* entirety of document * |