EP4106455 - TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE Taewoo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
OUCHI Wataru c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
NOGAMI Toshizo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIMURA Tomoki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 06 /
LIN Huifa c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 07 /
NAKASHIMA Daiichiro c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21753656.4 | 10.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021JP05031 | Priority number, date | JP20200022477 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020022477 | [2022/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021162050 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106455 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/1829, H04L5/00, // H04L1/1822, H04W72/21 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/51] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2022/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | Translation filed | 04.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP4057538 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0055] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0177] - [0181] * * paragraphs [0253] - [0255] * * paragraphs [0266] - [0273] * * figures 17, 24 *; | [X] - HUAWEI, "Feature lead summary#3 of HARQ enhancements for NR-U", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190903), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1909806 FL SUMMARY#3 FOR 72223 NRU HARQ, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98/Docs/R1-1909806.zip, (20190903), XP051766398 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [YA] - Anonymous, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Physical layer procedures for control (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 38.213nce Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20200114), vol. RAN WG1, no. V16.0.0, pages 1 - 146, XP051860806 [Y] 1, 3, 5, 7 * , sections 9.1.4, 9.2.3 sections 9.1.4, 9.2.3 * [A] 2, 4, 6, 8 | [YA] - Huawei, "Feature lead summary#3 of HARQ enhancements for NR-U", 3GPP Draft; R1-1909806 FL summary#3 for 72223 NRU HARQ, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190903), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, XP051766398 [Y] 1, 3, 5, 7 * , sections 2, 2.1.4, page 2, line 8, page 13, lines 22-23, page 14, lines 7, 45-49 page 2, line 8, page 13, lines 22-23, page 14, lines 7, 45-49 * [A] 2, 4, 6, 8 | [A] - ZTE, Sanechips, "Remaining issues on scheduling and HARQ for NR-U", 3GPP Draft; R1-1911824, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20191109), vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, XP051823018 [A] 1-8 * , section 2.4, page 6, lines 14-22, page 9, lines 1-18 * | [PX] - Sharp, "Remaining issues and corrections on HARQ enhancement for NR- U", 3GPP Draft; R1-2000874, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20200215), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20200224 - 20200306, XP051853489 [PX] 1-8 * , section 3.2 * | by applicant | JP2020022477 |